CA AB641 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 220, 221, and 11500 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Automobile dismantlers: catalytic converters.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] |
Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. Bill Essayli [R] |
Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
Asm. Kate Sanchez [R] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] | Asm. Tri Ta [R] | Asm. Greg Wallis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Assembly - AB 641 Vince Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB641 Vince Fong et al. By Archuleta (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 641 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB641 Vince Fong et al. By Archuleta (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 641 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 537, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3191.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2484.). |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1800.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 11500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |