CA AB631 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 102056 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to public transit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sacramento Regional Transit District: voting threshold.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB631 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - AB 631 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 94, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-07-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-07-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1881.).
2019-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2019-05-01SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-23SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1254.)
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-02-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2019-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code102056Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback