CA AB622 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2814 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: E-Verify system: unlawful business practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Assembly - AB 622 HERNANDEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB622 Roger Hern (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 622 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB622 Roger Hern (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AB 622 HERNANDEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 696, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 2910.). |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 2389.). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1545.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 13). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2814 | New Code | See Bill Text |