CA AB61 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 725, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 18150, 18170, and 18190 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gun violence restraining orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 61 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB61 Ting et al. By Skinner (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 61 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 725, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-12AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3113.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2489.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-07-08SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1503.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 23).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2019-01-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code18150Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18170Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code18190Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback