CA AB605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 56040.3 to the Education Code, relating to special education.
Title
Special education: assistive technology devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Assembly - AB 605 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB605 Maienschein et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Date (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB605 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 605 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB605 Maienschein et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Date (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB605 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 605 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 228, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2792.). |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2206.). |
2019-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1877.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1505.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56040.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |