CA AB599 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 48900, 48901.1, 48915, and 49079 of, and to add Section 48901.2 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.
Title
Suspensions and expulsions: tobacco.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 599 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 599 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1896.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48901.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 48915 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 49079 | New Code | See Bill Text |