CA AB582 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 43202.5 and 43202.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Vehicles: emissions: certification, auditing, and compliance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 582 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - ? (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 582 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - ? (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 1910.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 26). |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 20). |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43202.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 43202.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 43203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |