CA AB551 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-11 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-11 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to education funding.
Title
Community colleges: funding study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 551 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3890.) | |
2010-01-26 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 21). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-04-27 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). | |
2009-04-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 28. | |
2009-02-25 | Read first time. To print. |