CA AB542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5010.2.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to state parks.
Title
State parks: park entrance fees: waivers: 4th grade children.
Sponsors
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] |
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Sen. Kelly Seyarto [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5010.2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |