CA AB540 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8543.4 to the Government Code, relating to the State Auditor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor: Bureau of State Audits: budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-07-09 - Senate - Special Consent #12 AB540 Monning (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - AB 540 MONNING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-08-06 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2009.
2009-08-05 Approved by the Governor.
2009-07-30 Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2009-07-09 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2009-07-09 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1666.)
2009-07-02 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-06-30 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-06-29 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-06-23 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2009-05-21 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2009-05-11 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-11 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1364.)
2009-05-04 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-04-30 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 29).
2009-04-15 From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
2009-03-31 Referred to Com. on B. & P.
2009-02-26 From printer. May be heard in committee March 28.
2009-02-25 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8543.4New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_540&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20090225_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20090713_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_bill_20090806_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20090414_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20090429_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20090511_0230PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20090623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_0501-0550/ab_540_vote_20090709_0950AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback