CA AB525 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7093.6, 9278, 30459.15, 32471.5, 41171.5, 46628, 50156.18, 55332.5, and 60637 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
State Board of Equalization: California Department of Tax and Fee Administration: offer in compromise: extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB525 Aguiar-Curry By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 525 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 525 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 272, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2333.). |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1820.) |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30459.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32471.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41171.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 46628 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50156.18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55332.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60637 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7093.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9278 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |