CA AB523 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 490.4 of the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Organized retail theft: cargo.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 490.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB523 |
Text | https://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240AB523#99INT |