CA AB516 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-30 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2810.2, 2814.2, 4000, 14602, 22651, and 40206.5 of, and to repeal Sections 22651.7, 22651.8, and 22851.1 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Authority to remove vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 516 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 516 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 11. Page 1634.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 14602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22651 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22651.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22651.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22851.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2810.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2814.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 4000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40206.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |