CA AB507 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6904, 6909, 6918, and 16003 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Presidential electors.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB507 Bryan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 507 Bryan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - AB 507 Bryan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1827.). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1179.) |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 29). |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 16003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 6918 | Amended Code | Citation Text |