CA AB506 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 18975) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to youth service organizations.
Title
Youth service organizations: child abuse and neglect prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 506 Lorena Gonzalez Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB506 Lorena Gonzalez By Min (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 506 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB506 Lorena Gonzalez By Min (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - AB 506 Lorena Gonzalez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 169, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2619.). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2092.). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1431.) |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S. |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 18975 | New Code | See Bill Text |