CA AB499 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 24.5 (commencing with Section 20385) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority: job order contracting: pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Luz Rivas [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-07-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB499 Luz Rivas (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 499 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 499 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 87, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-07-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1915.). |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2119.) |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 1934.) |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 20385 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |