CA AB483 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 11.3 (commencing with Section 25230) to Chapter 6.5 of Division 20 of, and to add Chapter 10 (commencing with Section 39950) to Part 2 of Division 26 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to airports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airports: pollution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2017-03-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-14AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-02-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code25230New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code34312.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback