CA AB48 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-23 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1599.1 of, and to add Section 1599.15 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to nursing facilities.
Title
Nursing Facility Resident Informed Consent Protection Act of 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - Assembly - AB 48 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1599.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1599.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |