CA AB473 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6602, 6609, 13050, 13100, 13101, 13111, 13112, 13151, 13152, 13154, 13200, 13206, 13207, 13562, 13563, 13600, 13601, and 13602 of, to add Sections 13117, 13211, and 13565 to, and to add Part 21 (commencing with Section 890) to Division 2 of, the Probate Code, relating to estates.
Title
Disposition of estate without administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-08 - Assembly - AB 473 Maienschein Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB473 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 473 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB473 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 473 Maienschein Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 122, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2561.). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1877.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1190.) |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 13050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 13151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 13562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Probate Code | 13600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 6602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 6609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |