CA AB472 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 45190 and 88190 of the Education Code, relating to classified employees.
Title
Classified school district and community college employees: compulsory leaves of absence: compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB472 Wicks et al. By Portantino (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 472 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 472 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 331, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2414.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and APPR. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 8. Page 1987.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and HIGHER ED. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 45190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 88190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |