CA AB464 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 103625 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 14900 and 14900.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public documents.
Title
Public documents: driver’s licenses and vital records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 464 Schiavo Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB464 Schiavo et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 464 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB464 Schiavo et al (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 464 Schiavo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 5. Page 3046.). |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3011.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 2432.). |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-14 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 11). |
2023-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 6. Page 2002.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and TRANS. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103625 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14900.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |