CA AB455 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 56351.7, 56351.8, and 56351.9 of, and to add Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 56355) to Chapter 4 of Part 30 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to pupil instruction.
Title
Pupil instruction: special education: blind and visually impaired pupils: Deaf or Hard-of-Hearing pupils.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Assembly - AB 455 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1741.) |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 56351.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56351.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56351.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 56355 | New Code | See Bill Text |