CA AB455 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-25 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3507.7 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: local public employee organizations.
Sponsors
Asm. Nora Campos [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB455 Campos By Padilla (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Assembly - AB 455 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Assembly - AB 455 CAMPOS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-25 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-07-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |
2011-07-05 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-07-05 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 1712.). | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (May 9). | |
2011-04-25 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2011-04-07 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-04-07 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 876.) | |
2011-04-04 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-03-31 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-03-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 30). | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S. | |
2011-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2011-02-15 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3507.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |