CA AB452 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-17 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 8278.3 of, and to add and repeal Section 8278.4 of, the Education Code, relating to childcare.
Title
Childcare: facilities: grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 452 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2048.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and ED. |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8278.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8278.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |