CA AB450 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5019.5 and 72031 of, and to add Article 4 (commencing with Section 72040) to Chapter 1 of Part 45 of Division 7 of Title 3 of, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: community college trustee areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5019.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 72031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 72040 | New Code | See Bill Text |