CA AB443 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1209, 3041, 3041.1, 3041.2, 3041.3, 3056, 3057, 3110, and 3152 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry: scope of practice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-16 - Assembly - AB 443 SALAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB443 Salas By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 443 SALAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 549, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-27AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-09-16AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3544.).
2017-09-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2854.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-27SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1795.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24).
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25).
2017-02-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback