CA AB43 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10089.7 of the Insurance Code, relating to the California Earthquake Authority.
Title
California Earthquake Authority: employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 43 BLAKESLEE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB43 Blakeslee By Alquist (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 43 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB43 Blakeslee By Alquist (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 43 BLAKESLEE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3180.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 2153.) | |
2009-07-07 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-25 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-06-24 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 22). | |
2009-06-17 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |
2009-05-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-28 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1762.) | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |
2009-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2008-12-02 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |
2008-12-01 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10089.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |