CA AB402 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10144.55 to the Insurance Code, relating to disability income insurance.
Title
Disability income insurance: mental illness.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Assembly - AB 402 AMMIANO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB402 Ammiano By Beall (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 402 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB402 Ammiano By Beall (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 402 AMMIANO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 550, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2770.). |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1991.). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 1219.) |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10144.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |