CA AB401 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 316 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Development Department: language translations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 401 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1694.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
2021-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2021-02-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
2021-02-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code316Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback