CA AB394 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-08 - Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-09-08 - Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6356.7 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and use taxes: exemption: automobile manufacturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-01 - Assembly - AB 394 FUENTES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-08 | Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2280.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-09-04 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2009-08-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Page 1907.) | |
2009-07-08 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-17 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-06-11 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-06-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 1838.) | |
2009-05-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |
2009-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | |
2009-04-13 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6356.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |