CA AB388 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-08-26 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1296, 44908, 44909, 44929.21, and 44948.3 of, and to repeal Sections 44910, 44929.23, 44948, 44948.2, and 44948.5 of, the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
Certificated school employees: probationary employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 388 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 388 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 1826.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1296 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44908 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44909 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44910 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44929.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44929.23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44948 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44948.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44948.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44948.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |