CA AB388 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1536 of, and to add Section 1538.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 241.1, 635, 636, 730.6, 4096.5, and 11469 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 388 CHESBRO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB388 Chesbro By Mitchell (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - AB 388 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-22 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB388 Chesbro By Mitchell (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - AB 388 CHESBRO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 760, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6396.). |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 22). |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6233.) |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4613.). |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1262.) |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78211.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 78212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1534 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1538.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11469 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 241.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4096.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 628.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 636 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 730.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |