CA AB383 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 122405 of, and to add and repeal Section 122407 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health: hepatitis C.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-05-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2015-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2015-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code122405Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code122407New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback