CA AB382 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14094.17 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Whole Child Model program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB382 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 382 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By NAZARIAN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AB 382 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By NAZARIAN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 51, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1633.). |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1328.) |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1249.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 14). |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14094.17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |