CA AB370 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 22575 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumers: internet privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-26 - Assembly - AB 370 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB370 Muratsuchi By Padilla (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Assembly - AB 370 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Arts, Entertain, Sports, Tourism, & Internet Media (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-03AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2013-08-26AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2691.).
2013-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1942.).
2013-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
2013-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-18SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
2013-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2013-05-15SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2013-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1218.)
2013-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 23).
2013-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2013-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2013-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2013-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code22575Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code22577Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_370&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130214_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130603_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130214_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130319_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130603_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130618_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130828_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_bill_20130927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130416_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130423_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130502_0955AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130610_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130625_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130822_0935AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_370_vote_20130826_1214PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback