CA AB37 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 312, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3000.5, 3016.7, 3019.7, 3020, and 15101 of, to add Section 3025.5 to, and to repeal Section 3016.5 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: vote by mail ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-03 - Assembly - AB 37 Berman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB37 Berman et al. By Umberg (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 37 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 37 Berman Assembly Third Reading Amend By SEYARTO Set #2 Motion to Lay on the Table By REYES (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 37 Berman Assembly Third Reading Amend By GALLAGHER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By REYES (Y: 54 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 312, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-03AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 17.).
2021-09-03AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 16.)
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7.).
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12).
2021-07-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-05-19AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2021-04-07AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ELECTIONS. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on ELECTIONS.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback