CA AB368 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 784.7 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: jurisdiction of public offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Muratsuchi et al. By Stern (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 368 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - AB 368 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2697.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 646.) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 784.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |