CA AB361 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 3.9 (commencing with Section 14127) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medi-Cal: Health Homes for Medi-Cal Enrollees and

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - Assembly - AB 361 MITCHELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB361 Mitchell By Monning (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Assembly - AB 361 MITCHELL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 642, Statutes of 2013.
2013-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-25AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 3205.).
2013-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 2307.).
2013-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2013-08-12SenateIn committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2013-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-18SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-13SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-06-03SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 1807.)
2013-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2013-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (April 2).
2013-03-19AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2013-02-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2013-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 17.
2013-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14127New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_361&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130214_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130404_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130524_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130619_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130903_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130906_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_bill_20131008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130402_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130524_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130530_1248PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130703_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130812_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130830_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130910_0436PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_361_vote_20130911_0338PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback