CA AB356 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 103050 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to human remains.
Title
Human remains: disposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Assembly - AB 356 BIGELOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB356 Bigelow (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB356 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 356 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB356 Bigelow (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB356 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - AB 356 BIGELOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 187, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2752.). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1933.). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 723.) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 103050 | Amended Code | Citation Text |