CA AB347 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-11 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 109015) to Chapter 15 of Part 3 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to consumer protection.
Title
Household product safety: toxic substances: testing and enforcement.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 347 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 347 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 1999.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 109015 | New Code | See Bill Text |