CA AB343 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 8.5 (commencing with Section 4615) to Chapter 8 of Part 2 of Division 4 of the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry.
Title
Forestry: fuels transportation program: grant program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2020-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 4615 | New Code | See Bill Text |