CA AB3372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-30 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18671 and 25113 of, and to repeal and add Section 19264 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: administration: earnings withholding: water’s edge elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3372 REV. & TAX. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-23SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2020-06-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.)
2020-06-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2020-06-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
2020-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2020-05-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2020-03-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
2020-03-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code18671Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code19264New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code25113Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback