CA AB335 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 490.8 of the Penal Code, relating to retail theft.
Title
Retail theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 7). |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2023-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 490.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |