CA AB33 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to Com. on PUB S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 11455 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances.
Title
Fentanyl Addiction and Overdose Prevention Task Force.
Sponsors
Asm. Jasmeet Bains [D] | Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Joe Patterson [R] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Asm. Rick Zbur [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 33 Bains Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11455 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |