CA AB329 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 368 of the Penal Code, relating to elder and dependent adult abuse.
Title
Elder and dependent adult abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on AGING & L.T.C. and PUB. S. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 5002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB329 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB329 |