CA AB3289 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Taxation: tax expenditures: information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Assembly - AB 3289 Revenue and Taxation Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 19. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |