CA AB327 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 382, 399.15, 739.1, 2827, and 2827.10 of, to amend and renumber Section 2827.1 of, to add Sections 769 and 2827.1 to, and to repeal and add Sections 739.9 and 745 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Electricity: natural gas: rates: net energy metering:
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] | Asm. Joan Buchanan [D] | Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Sen. Susan Eggman [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 327 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB327 Perea (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB327 Perea Lay on Table (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 327 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB327 Perea (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB327 Perea Lay on Table (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Assembly - AB 327 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 611, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3288.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Taken up without reference to file by unanimous consent. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 2237.). |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-04 | Senate | Measure version as amended on September 3 corrected. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Measure version as amended on September 3 corrected. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 1563.) |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 382 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 739.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 745 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 769 | New Code | See Bill Text |