CA AB3265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8547.4, 8547.5, 8547.7, 8547.8, 8547.10, 8547.12, 8547.13, 19175, 19575, 19585, 19683, and 19683.5 of the Government Code, relating to whistleblower protection.
Title
Whistleblowers: California State Auditor: State Personnel Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19683 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19683.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8547.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3265 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3265 |