CA AB3252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 15).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9268, 9272, 9574, 24000, 24001, 24004, 24007, 24009, 24010, 24011, and 24011.6 of, and to repeal Sections 9141, 9142, and 9162 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animal health, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3252 AGRI. (Caballero) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3252 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2018-08-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-06SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-07-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-07-02SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
2018-03-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code24000Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24001Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24004Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24007Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24009Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24010Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24011Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code24011.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9141Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9142Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9162Repealed CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9268Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9272Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9574Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback