CA AB3251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to armories.
Title
Sale of armories.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3251 V. A. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By IRWIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB3251 V.A (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3251 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB3251 V.A (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3251 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6828.). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5704.). |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and A. & A.R. |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |